AR SB306 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB306 is now Act 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB306 is now Act 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning A Noncustodial Parent's Unsupervised Visitation With His Or Her Child; To Amend Definitions Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989; And To Amend The Law On Probable Cause Hearings And The Termination Of Parental Rights.
Title
Concerning A Noncustodial Parent's Unsupervised Visitation With His Or Her Child; To Amend Definitions Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989; And To Amend The Law On Probable Cause Hearings And The Termination Of Parental Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB306 is now Act 1111 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |