AR SB51 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Notification that SB51 is now Act 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Notification that SB51 is now Act 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Contractors Licensing Board Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Contractors Licensing Board Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Notification that SB51 is now Act 27 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-02-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-02-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed |