AR SB52 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit The Collection Of Retirement Benefits By Persons Convicted Of A Felony Offense Arising From Official Actions As A Public Employee; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit The Collection Of Retirement Benefits By Persons Convicted Of A Felony Offense Arising From Official Actions As A Public Employee; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2019-03-19SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-01-03SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback