HI SCR51 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of A Continuous Legislative Session, Extending The Legislative Session, And Adding Additional Recess Days.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of A Continuous Legislative Session, Extending The Legislative Session, And Adding Additional Recess Days.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 380) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3609) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR55 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 18
SR39 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
SR39 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Subjects
Additional Recess Days
Continuous Legislative Session
Extended Legislative Session
Legislative Reference Bureau
Study
Continuous Legislative Session
Extended Legislative Session
Legislative Reference Bureau
Study