AR SB541 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB541 is now Act 1241
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB541 is now Act 1241
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Revenues From The Temporary Sales And Use Tax Levied Under Amendment 91 To The Arkansas Constitution To Be Pledged To Retire Local Capital Improvement Bonds Issued For Certain Projects.
Title
To Allow Revenues From The Temporary Sales And Use Tax Levied Under Amendment 91 To The Arkansas Constitution To Be Pledged To Retire Local Capital Improvement Bonds Issued For Certain Projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Maloch [D] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB541 is now Act 1241 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-01 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |