AR SB607 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Electronic Payment Transactions Under The Alcoholic Beverages Law And To Declare And Emergency.
Title
An Act Concerning Electronic Payment Transactions Under The Alcoholic Beverages Law And To Declare And Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB607 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB607.pdf |