AR SB617 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB617 is now Act 938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB617 is now Act 938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing The Law Concerning The Arkansas Coalition For Juvenile Justice.
Title
Repealing The Law Concerning The Arkansas Coalition For Juvenile Justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notification that SB617 is now Act 938 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed |