AR SB618 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Early Childhood Education Workforce Quality Incentive Act; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For Certain Early Childhood Education Workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Early Childhood Education Workforce Quality Incentive Act; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For Certain Early Childhood Education Workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback