AR SB694 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB694 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB694 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding The Ballot Form For A Judicial Election.
Title
Regarding The Ballot Form For A Judicial Election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB694 is now Act 1075 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |