AR SB871 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Congressional Districts In Arkansas Based Upon The Most Recent Census Data.
Title
To Establish The Congressional Districts In Arkansas Based Upon The Most Recent Census Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-04-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-04-06 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-04-05 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |