AR SB913 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate The Use Of Certain Drugs Used To Induce An Abortion; And To Provide For Disciplinary Proceedings For Abortions Performed In Violation Of This Act.
Title
To Regulate The Use Of Certain Drugs Used To Induce An Abortion; And To Provide For Disciplinary Proceedings For Abortions Performed In Violation Of This Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Tommy Wren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB913 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB913.pdf |