AZ HB2029 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care; day camps; exemption
Title
Child care; day camps; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House final reading , voting: (45-14-1-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-10 | House read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |