AZ HB2041 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DHS; health care institutions; licensure
Title
DHS; health care institutions; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 122 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | House third reading None voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-11 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Department Of Health Services
Health Care Institutions
Health Care Providers
Licensure
Public Health And Safety
Health Care Institutions
Health Care Providers
Licensure
Public Health And Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 449.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |