AZ HB2050 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of psychologist examiners
Title
Board of psychologist examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-7-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-29 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Board Of Psychologist Examiners
Credentials
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Psychologist Examiners
Credentials
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Psychologist Examiners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2071.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |