AZ HB2116 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fatality review; information; access
Title
Fatality review; information; access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 130 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (47-12-1-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurs |
2024-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-1-3-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-8-4-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-29 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Access
Access To Information (s)
Child Fatalities
Classification (s)
Confidentiality (s)
Fatality Review
Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Violation (s)
Access To Information (s)
Child Fatalities
Classification (s)
Confidentiality (s)
Fatality Review
Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Violation (s)