AZ HB2133 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Air quality nonattainment areas; designation
Title
Air quality nonattainment areas; designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | House final reading , voting: (48-11-1-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-26 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (53-3-4-0) | |
2010-03-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0-0) | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-14 | House read second time | |
2010-01-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in House and read first time |