AZ HB2133 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Correctional facilities; community notification
Title
Correctional facilities; community notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Chapter 314 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2017-05-10 | House | House concurs |
2017-05-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-05-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-05-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Department Of Corrections
Department Of Education
Legislative Districts
Notice Requirements
President Of The Senate
Speaker Of The House Of Representatives
State Government
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Department Of Corrections
Department Of Education
Legislative Districts
Notice Requirements
President Of The Senate
Speaker Of The House Of Representatives
State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1604.12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1609.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |