AZ HB2140 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral services; alkaline hydrolysis
Title
Funeral services; alkaline hydrolysis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 133 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (40-19-1-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurs |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-1-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Advisory Committee (s)
Alkaline Hydrolysis
Definitions (s)
Department (s)
Disciplinary Actions (s)
Embalmers
Fees
Funeral Services
License (s)
Licensure (s)
Power And Duties (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Records
Repeal
Requirements (s)
Alkaline Hydrolysis
Definitions (s)
Department (s)
Disciplinary Actions (s)
Embalmers
Fees
Funeral Services
License (s)
Licensure (s)
Power And Duties (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Records
Repeal
Requirements (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1331 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1338 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1343 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1344 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1365.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1365.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1366 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1367 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1368 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1374 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1386 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1388 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1390.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1390.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1394.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1396 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |