AZ HB2156 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credits; motion picture credits
Title
Tax credits; motion picture credits
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Chapter 387 | |
2022-07-06 | Governor Without Signature | |
2022-06-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2022-06-23 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (39-18-3-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurs |
2022-06-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Motion Picture Production Program (s)
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Audit (s)
Confidential Information (s)
Definitions (s)
Delayed Repeal (s)
Exemption From Rulemaking (s)
Fee (s)
Income Tax Credit Review Schedule (s)
Information Change Requirement
Intent (s)
Motion Picture Credits (s)
Penalties (s)
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose (s)
Report (s)
Revolving Fund Uses (s)
Rulemaking (s)
Setoff For Debts (s)
State Government - Title 41 (s)
Tax Credits (s)
Taxation - Title 42 (s)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43 (s)
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Audit (s)
Confidential Information (s)
Definitions (s)
Delayed Repeal (s)
Exemption From Rulemaking (s)
Fee (s)
Income Tax Credit Review Schedule (s)
Information Change Requirement
Intent (s)
Motion Picture Credits (s)
Penalties (s)
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose (s)
Report (s)
Revolving Fund Uses (s)
Rulemaking (s)
Setoff For Debts (s)
State Government - Title 41 (s)
Tax Credits (s)
Taxation - Title 42 (s)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43 (s)