AZ HB2159 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Conference members: WORSLEY, FANN, OTONDO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Conference members: WORSLEY, FANN, OTONDO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic violations; traffic survival school
Title
Traffic violations; traffic survival school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Sen Petersen to exclude the Worsley #2 Flr. Amend. (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Sen Petersen to exclude the Worsley #2 Flr. Amend. (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: WORSLEY, FANN, OTONDO |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference members: CAMPBELL, ANDRADE, MESNARD |
2018-04-17 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference appointed |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 644 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |