AZ HB2160 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (9-21-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (9-21-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; election procedures
Title
Homeowners' associations; election procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (9-21-0-0) | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Consent Calendar April 02, 2012 @ 1:05 PM with Objections | |
2012-04-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |