AZ HB2169 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Barbering, cosmetology, massage therapy; consolidation
Title
Barbering, cosmetology, massage therapy; consolidation
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Barbering
Consolidation
Cosmetology
Effect
Massage Therapy
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Retention Of Members
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Transfer
Barbering
Consolidation
Cosmetology
Effect
Massage Therapy
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Retention Of Members
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Transfer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4204 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3025.10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3028.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |