AZ HB2205 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic benefit transfer prohibitions; TANF
Title
Electronic benefit transfer prohibitions; TANF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-05-14 | House | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | House RHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RHS Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RHS Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |