AZ HB2215 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax assessment of retention basins
Title
Tax assessment of retention basins
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Vetoed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Consent Calendar April 14, 2010 @ 1:00 PM | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (36-24-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |