AZ HB2256 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax subtraction; uniformed services pay
Title
Tax subtraction; uniformed services pay
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Rep. Douglas Coleman [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] |
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |