AZ HB2290 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Certificates of operation; interfacility transfers
Title
Certificates of operation; interfacility transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander Kolodin [R] | Rep. Rachel Jones [R] | Rep. Teresa Martinez [R] | Rep. Cory McGarr [R] |
Rep. Barbara Parker [R] | Rep. Michele Pena [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] | Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Sen. Eva Burch [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Certificates Of Operation
Eligible Entities
Emergency Medical Services
Exemption
Fees
Initial Certification Of Operation
Interfacility Transfers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewal
Term
Eligible Entities
Emergency Medical Services
Exemption
Fees
Initial Certification Of Operation
Interfacility Transfers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewal
Term
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |