AZ HB2372 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conservatorships; guardianships; county reimbursement
Title
Conservatorships; guardianships; county reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (50-7-3-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |