AZ HB2411 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal trespass; unlawful activity
Title
Criminal trespass; unlawful activity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |