AZ HB2414 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (6-17-7-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (6-17-7-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public records; burdensome requests
Title
Public records; burdensome requests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (6-17-7-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |