AZ HB2437 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-19-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-19-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Federal mandates; proof of constitutionality
Title
Federal mandates; proof of constitutionality
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-19-0-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-3-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Senate GR Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-23 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |