AZ HB2438 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT; administration; licensing; planning
Title
ADOT; administration; licensing; planning
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Administration
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Licensing
Planning
Transportation - Title 28
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Licensing
Planning
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3230 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 375 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |