AZ HB2442 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Greenhouse gas emissions; regulations
Title
Greenhouse gas emissions; regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (18-10-2-0) | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-16 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | House third reading , voting: (35-23-1-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |