AZ HB2448 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Just compensation; tax credits
Title
Just compensation; tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House COM Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |