AZ HB2478 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; local board composition
Title
PSPRS; local board composition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (36-19-5-0) | |
2010-04-20 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House PERER Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House PERER Committee | |
2010-01-25 | House read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to House PERER Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced in House and read first time |