AZ HB2493 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community facilities districts
Title
Community facilities districts
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 719 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 723 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 729 | New Code | See Bill Text |