AZ HB2494 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Internal revenue code; conformity
Title
Internal revenue code; conformity
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 24 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-1-5-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-3-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |