AZ HB2547 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (10-16-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (10-16-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Major event public safety reimbursement
Title
Major event public safety reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (10-16-4-0) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |