AZ HB2605 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - Referred to Senate GOV Committee
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - Referred to Senate GOV Committee
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Subdivisions; acting in concert
Title
Subdivisions; acting in concert
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-29 | House third reading , voting: (33-23-4-0) | |
2010-03-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 3:26 PM with Objections | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House and read first time |