AZ HB2626 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Empowerment scholarship accounts; expansion
Title
Empowerment scholarship accounts; expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor Vetoed | |
2012-03-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House final reading , voting: (39-15-6-0) | |
2012-03-29 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-26 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-16-5-0) | |
2012-02-27 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |