AZ HB2641 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Condominiums; declaration; amendment; consent requirement
Title
Condominiums; declaration; amendment; consent requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate read second time | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-30 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-30 | House third reading , voting: (34-24-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |