AZ HB2688 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fireworks; permissible uses; fines
Title
Fireworks; permissible uses; fines
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Ethan Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-7-7-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |