AZ HB2719 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School district boundaries; change
Title
School district boundaries; change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (52-2-5-0) | |
2010-03-02 | House Consent Calendar March 02, 2010 @ 3:55 PM | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |