AZ HB2831 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Border operations center; wire tax
Title
Border operations center; wire tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-3-3-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-23 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-21 | House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |