AZ HB2852 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Senate Conference members: ROGERS, BENNETT, SUNDARESHAN
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Senate Conference members: ROGERS, BENNETT, SUNDARESHAN
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registrations; organizations; prohibition
Title
Voter registrations; organizations; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Heap [R] | Rep. Joseph Chaplik [R] | Rep. John Gillette [R] | Rep. Rachel Jones [R] |
Rep. David Marshall [R] | Rep. Barbara Parker [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Parker [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference members: ROGERS, BENNETT, SUNDARESHAN |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference members: HEAP, PARKER J, TERECH |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference appointed |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Elections And Electors - Title 16 (s)
Organizations (s)
Prohibition (s)
Registration (s)
Registration Rolls (s)
Verification (s)
Voter Registrations (s)
Organizations (s)
Prohibition (s)
Registration (s)
Registration Rolls (s)
Verification (s)
Voter Registrations (s)