AZ HCR2014 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - House final reading , voting: (6-50-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - House final reading , voting: (6-50-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage
Title
Minimum wage
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (6-50-4-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-29-3-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |