AZ HCR2015 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Financial sustainability support
Title
Financial sustainability support
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate SDBR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-1-2-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate SDBR Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate SDBR Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House GHE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |