AZ SB1012 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; technical registration board
Title
Technical correction; technical registration board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Senate final reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-30 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-29 | House TI Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-16 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-15 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-9-1-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate PSHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-03 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |