AZ SB1015 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions department; revolving fund
Title
Financial institutions department; revolving fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-26 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-6-0) | |
2012-03-19 | House Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 4:40 PM | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-4-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-20 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-01-19 | Transmit to House | |
2012-01-19 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate Consent Calendar January 17, 2012 @ 2:02 PM | |
2012-01-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-17 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-17 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |