AZ SB1059 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human trafficking; definition
Title
Human trafficking; definition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-02-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-11 | House third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | House Consent Calendar February 01, 2010 @ 2:44 PM | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-13 | House read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-11 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Consent Calendar February 01, 2010 @ 2:44 PM | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |