AZ SB1114 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outdoor advertising
Title
Outdoor advertising
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 237 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House third reading None voting: (35-18-6-0) |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |